Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Pedro Zarranz y Pueyo

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1903BornPamplona
19 Sep 192522.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 194642.6AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
28 Apr 194642.8Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
14 Nov 197370.4DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Pedro Zarranz y Pueyo:
Bishop Juan Pedro Zarranz y Pueyo (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015