Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmelo Ballester y Nieto, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1881Born
16 Aug 190322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
12 Feb 193856.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
15 May 193857.2Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
10 Jun 194362.3AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
9 Oct 194867.6AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
31 Jan 194967.9DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Ballester y Nieto
Archbishop Carmelo Ballester y Nieto C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartagena

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018