Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José González Díez, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1566BornVilladiezma
29 Feb 161649.2AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
Apr 1616³49.3Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
30 Mar 162558.3SelectedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
28 Jul 162558.7ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
14 Jan 162760.1SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
17 May 162760.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Aug 163063.7AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Mar 1631³64.3DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José González Díez:
Archbishop José González Díez O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123, and Page 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 158
  • bd/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,826
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 133, Number 852

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015