Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Benegas Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1606AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
10 Oct 1610AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
6 Oct 1614DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Benegas Figueroa:
Bishop Antonio Benegas Figueroa (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

Source(s):
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271, and Page 311
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 122, Number 776

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015