Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Elizalde Espinal

Bishop of Vitoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1960 BornMezkiritz
3 Oct 198727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
8 Jan 201655.5AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
12 Mar 201655.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vitoria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Elizalde Espinal
Bishop Juan Carlos Elizalde Espinal (born ) Bishop of Vitoria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vitoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016