Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé de Carranza y Miranda, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503²Born
10 Dec 155754.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
27 Feb 155855.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
2 May 157673.3DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de Carranza y Miranda (VIAF: 14799490)
Archbishop Bartolomé de Carranza y Miranda O.P. (born 1503, died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiranda de Arga, Diocese of Pamplona
Ordained BishopS. Dominique, Convent, Bruxelles

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 68, Number 392
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018