Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Méchin

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1316AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
2 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
26 Apr 1324AppointedBishop of Dol, France
15 Mar 1328DiedBishop of Dol, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Méchin
Bishop Guillaume Méchin (died ) Bishop of Dol

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 225, and Page 493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast