Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás Muniz Pablos

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1874BornCastaño de Robledo
18 Dec 189723.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 192854.1AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
10 Mar 192854.1AppointedBishop of Tudela, Spain
3 Jun 192854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
27 Jun 192854.4InstalledBishop of Pamplona, Spain
13 Aug 193561.5AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
15 Mar 194874.1DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Muniz Pablos:
Archbishop Tomás Muniz Pablos (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013