Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Basilios Cardinal Bessarion, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thebae

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Titular See: (Nicaea of the Greeks)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1403BornTrebizond, Greece
1437²34.0AppointedArchbishop
11 Nov 143734.9Ordained BishopArchbishop
18 Dec 143937.0Elevated to Cardinal
1440²37.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
8 Jan 144037.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
5 May 144744.3AppointedAdministrator of Manfredonia, Italy
5 Mar 144946.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
28 Mar 144946.2AppointedAdministrator of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
7 Apr 144946.3ResignedAdministrator of Manfredonia, Italy
23 Apr 144946.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Oct 144946.8AppointedAdministrator of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
13 Mar 145855.2ResignedAdministrator of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
26 Jul 145855.6AppointedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
25 Oct 145855.8ResignedAdministrator of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
18 May 146259.4ResignedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
Apr 1463³60.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
14 Oct 146865.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
18 Nov 147269.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Thebae

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilios Bessarion:
Cardinal Basilios Bessarion O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Thebae

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
  • a cardinal for 32.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013