Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sancho Dávila y Toledo

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1546Born
26 Apr 159144.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Oct 159145.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
10 Jan 160053.2AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
20 Jul 161568.7AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
11 Jul 162275.7AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
6 Dec 162680.1DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Sancho Dávila y Toledo (VIAF: 120281039)
Bishop Sancho Dávila y Toledo (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvila, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopSte Anne, Monastery, Avila, Diocese of Ávila

  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 104, Number 654
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 311, and Page 282
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast