Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco López de Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545²Born
8 Aug 162277.6AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
23 Oct 162277.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
1 Mar 162378.1DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco López de Mendoza
Bishop Francisco López de Mendoza (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlhambra de Granada

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,389
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,833
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 311
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 143, Number 909
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast