Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pascual Cardinal de Aragón-Córdoba-Cardona y Fernández de Córdoba

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626²Born
1655²29.0Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
5 Apr 166034.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 166135.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
1 Feb 166640.0AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Feb 166640.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Sep 167751.7DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pascual de Aragón-Córdoba-Cardona y Fernández de Córdoba (VIAF: 87869537)
Pascual Cardinal de Aragón-Córdoba-Cardona y Fernández de Córdoba (born 1626, died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalau de la Riera, Mataró

  • a priest for 22.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
  • a cardinal for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1660
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 201, Number 1,260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018