Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Adarzo de Santander y Martínez de Viaín, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1596³Born
9 Mar 165457.2AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
22 Mar 165457.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
17 Apr 165760.3SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
24 Sep 165760.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
3 Apr 167477.3DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Adarzo de Santander y Martínez de Viaín
Archbishop Gabriel Adarzo de Santander y Martínez de Viaín O. de M. (born Dec 1596, died ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205, and Page 369
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 183, Number 1,144
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018