Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Baltasar Cardinal Moscoso y Sandoval

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1589BornAltamira
2 Dec 161526.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Feb 161626.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
29 Apr 161930.1AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
25 Jul 161930.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
12 Aug 163041.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
28 May 164657.2AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
17 Sep 166576.5DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar Moscoso y Sandoval:
Baltasar Cardinal Moscoso y Sandoval (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
  • a cardinal for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615
  • bp/bd/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,830
  • ob/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 138, Number 881
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194, and Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015