Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Maria Ciria Panvini, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1610Born
25 Oct 162515.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
1 Jun 165443.6AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
14 Jun 165443.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
4 Apr 165645.4DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Ciria Panvini (VIAF: 309607057)
Archbishop Angelo Maria Ciria Panvini O.S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona
Ordained BishopSan Marcello, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 32
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018