Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pacifico Trasi (Trani), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1600Born
23 Mar 162424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
24 Mar 164242.0AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
6 Apr 164242.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
31 Dec 165959.8DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Trasi (Trani)
Bishop Pacifico Trasi (Trani) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aracoeli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 129
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 43
  • ob/c2+: AT, 14 Nov 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017