Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Fabrizio Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1621Born
20 Dec 164827.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 165634.0AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
16 Jan 165634.0Ordained BishopBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
1 Sep 168260.7DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

MicroData Summary for Carlo Fabrizio Giustiniani
Bishop Carlo Fabrizio Giustiniani (born , died ) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,656, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast