Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Pietro Antonio Giarda, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1595Born
24 Feb 161317.4ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
14 Mar 162024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
18 May 164852.6AppointedBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
1 Jun 164852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
18 Mar 164953.4DiedBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Pietro Antonio Giarda (VIAF: 4930316)
Bishop Cristoforo Pietro Antonio Giarda B. (born , died ) Bishop of Castro [del Lazio]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVespolate
Ordained BishopSan Carlo ai Catinari, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,421
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 140
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 21
  • ob/c2: AT, 17 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017