Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Paggi, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornJannae
14 Jun 165540.5AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
20 Jun 165540.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
8 Feb 166348.1DiedBishop of Brugnato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Paggi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Paggi B. (died ) Bishop of Brugnato

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 117, Number 717
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013