Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Sergardi

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1596³Born
10 Apr 162125.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 164145.5AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
3 Nov 164145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
Apr 1649³53.0DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Sergardi
Bishop Alessandro Sergardi (born Apr 1596, died Apr 1649) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienna
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 22
  • ob/c2: AT, 15 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018