Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Panzani, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1592BornRoma
7 Mar 162532.3ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
1626²33.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
13 Aug 164047.8AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
2 Sep 164047.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
25 Jun 166067.6DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Panzani:
Bishop Gregorio Panzani C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Mileto

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 242
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015