Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Bottoni (Bettoni), T.O.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Frascati, Italy

Titular Bishop of Coronea


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1655AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Frascati, Italy
30 Aug 1655AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
12 Sep 1655Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea

MicroData Summary
Marco Antonio Bottoni (Bettoni)
Bishop Marco Antonio Bottoni (Bettoni) T.O.R.
,
Auxiliary Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanti Cosma e Damiano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 166
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 25
  • ob: AT, 4 Nov 2016
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025