Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Febei

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585²Born
9 Jul 163550.5AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
15 Jul 163550.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
4 Aug 164964.5DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Febei
Bishop Pietro Paolo Febei (born 1585, died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrvieto, Diocese of Orvieto
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 15
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017