Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Rezzani

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona), France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1635AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
30 Sep 1635Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
Jul 1639³DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Rezzani
Bishop Benedetto Rezzani (died Jul 1639) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiri, Diocese of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea della Valle, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,635, Number 22
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jun 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast