Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gaeta (Caieta)

Deceased

Bishop of Bitetto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹Born
30 Aug 165550.6AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
12 Sep 165550.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bitetto, Italy
2 Mar 166964.1DiedBishop of Bitetto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gaeta (Caieta)
Bishop Francesco Gaeta (Caieta) (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Bitetto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalerno
Ordained BishopSanti Cosma e Damiano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 26
  • ob: AT, 4 Nov 2016
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018