Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Franzoni

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1612Born
29 Apr 165845.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
5 Apr 166047.3Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 166047.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
7 Jun 166653.5AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
13 Jun 166653.5Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
14 Jan 166956.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
14 May 167057.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
27 Feb 167360.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
30 Apr 168572.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
10 Nov 168774.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
28 Sep 169380.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Nov 169380.9ResignedBishop of Camerino, Italy
19 Dec 169785.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Franzoni (VIAF: 88918395)
Giacomo Cardinal Franzoni (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Santa Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 31.5 years
  • a cardinal for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Apr 1658
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 15
  • ob/c34: AT, 6 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017