Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Paravicino

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641¹BornMilano
12 May 168140.3AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
18 May 168140.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
26 Sep 169554.7DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Paravicino:
Bishop Ottavio Paravicino (born 1641, died ) Bishop of Mileto

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015