Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Maurelli (Castiglion Morelli)

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornRoma
31 Aug 164346.6AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
6 Sep 164346.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
22 Feb 164952.1DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maurelli (Castiglion Morelli):
Archbishop Alfonso Maurelli (Castiglion Morelli) (died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015