Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Vannini

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornRoma
Jun 1643³42.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 164342.5AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
23 Aug 164342.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
1653¹52.0DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Vannini:
Bishop Bartolomeo Vannini , Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 9.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 257
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jan 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015