Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitaliano Marescano

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornCatanzaro
14 Mar 166161.2AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
20 Mar 166161.2Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
18 Mar 166767.2DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vitaliano Marescano:
Bishop Vitaliano Marescano (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 123, Number 749
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015