Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Gabrielli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sant’Alessio

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹BornRome
16 Dec 164137.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Feb 164238.1AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
10 Feb 164238.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
27 Apr 164238.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
10 Nov 164238.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
14 May 165551.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
6 Mar 165652.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
18 Jul 166763.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
14 Nov 166763.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
30 Jan 166864.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
12 Mar 166864.1AppointedAdministrator of Rieti, Italy
2 Aug 167066.5ResignedAdministrator of Rieti, Italy
31 Aug 167773.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Gabrielli:
Giulio Cardinal Gabrielli (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sant’Alessio

  • a bishop for 35.3 years
  • a cardinal for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 107, Number 647
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1642, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015