Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Septala

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1626BornMilano
21 Sep 165832.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 168256.0AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
10 May 168256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
31 May 169771.1DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Septala:
Bishop Lodovico Septala (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015