Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Vicentini

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1638Born
21 Sep 167032.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 167032.5AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
11 Jan 167132.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
20 Jun 170264.0DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Vicentini
Bishop Ippolito Vicentini (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRieti

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018