Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Torosowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹Born
1626²21.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 162722.0Ordained BishopBishop
24 Oct 163025.8Converted
22 May 163530.3AppointedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
24 Oct 168176.8DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Torosowicz
Archbishop Mikołaj Torosowicz (born 1605, died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)
Death PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 54.7 years

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,156
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,811
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 1
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 2
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast