Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vartan Hunanian

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1644Born
1662¹17.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
1665²20.8Converted
166520.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 167530.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
28 Jan 167530.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Epiphania in Syria
28 Apr 167531.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Epiphania in Syria
24 Oct 168137.6SucceededArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
15 Jun 171571.3DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Vartan Hunanian (VIAF: 38735180)
Archbishop Vartan Hunanian (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTokat
Death PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 196, and Page 243
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: CB, 28 Jul 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 8
  • od/conv/op: CB, 20 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018