Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Tarło

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1672Born
30 Jan 171341.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
30 Jan 171341.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
26 May 171341.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
1717²45.0AppointedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
16 Dec 172048.9AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
172250.0DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Tarło
Bishop Piotr Tarło (born 1672, died 1722) Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 161, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,713, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast