Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Stanisław Święcicki

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640¹BornZuzelien
25 Feb 169757.1AppointedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
14 Apr 169757.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
18 May 169959.3AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
1709¹69.0DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Stanisław Święcicki:
Bishop Mikołaj Stanisław Święcicki (born 1640, died 1709) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,447
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 13 Jun 2015