Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kazimierz de Alten Bokum

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹Born
2 Feb 168923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
18 Jul 170135.5AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
24 Aug 1701³35.6Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
27 Jun 171852.4SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Jul 171953.5ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Jun 172155.4DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Kazimierz de Alten Bokum:
Bishop Jan Kazimierz de Alten Bokum (born 1666, died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,448
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178, and Page 324
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015