Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Rafael Fuentes Martín

Bishop Emeritus of Minas, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1945 Born
5 Aug 197328.4Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
16 Oct 201065.6AppointedBishop of Minas, Uruguay
28 Nov 201065.7Ordained BishopBishop of Minas, Uruguay
2 Mar 202075.0RetiredBishop of Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Jaime Rafael Fuentes Martín
Bishop Jaime Rafael Fuentes Martín (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Minas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo
Ordained BishopInmaculada Concepción, Cathedral, Minas, Diocese of Minas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Minas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,867
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast