Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philipp von Daun-Oberstein

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1508SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
31 Jan 1509ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Nov 1509Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Feb 1515DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp von Daun-Oberstein
Archbishop Philipp von Daun-Oberstein (died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,509, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast