Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Peter von Quentell

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1650BornKöln
167322.2Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 May 169847.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
16 May 169847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
14 Aug 169948.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
13 Apr 171059.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Peter von Quentell:
Bishop Johann Peter von Quentell (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 37.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 69
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015