Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian Heinrich von Weichs zu Rösberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Rhodiapolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1651BornBonn
1677¹25.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 170352.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1 Oct 170352.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
22 Jul 170453.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
20 Sep 172372.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Heinrich von Weichs zu Rösberg:
Bishop Maximilian Heinrich von Weichs zu Rösberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015