Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Heribert von Köln

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
970¹Born
9 Jul 99929.5AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Dec 99929.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 Mar 102151.2DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Heribert von Köln (VIAF: 56274397)
Archbishop St. Heribert von Köln (born 970, died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWorms
Ordained BishopKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,699

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast