Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Walenburch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornRotterdam
30 Mar 164131.2Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Jan 165848.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
28 Jan 165848.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
1670¹60.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
21 Dec 167565.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Walenburch:
Bishop Peter Walenburch (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 34.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69, and Page 251
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015