Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolf von Altena

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1157¹Born
21 Nov 119336.8AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
27 Mar 119437.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Mar 120548.1ResignedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 May 121255.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1215²58.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
15 Apr 122063.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolf von Altena (VIAF: 32922231)
Archbishop Adolf von Altena (born 1157, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 198
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 270
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Jul 2020

Quantcast