Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno von Berg

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1100¹Born
25 Dec 113131.9AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Dec 113232.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
30 May 113737.4DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bruno von Berg (VIAF: 40172411)
Archbishop Bruno von Berg (born 1100, died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Jul 2020

Quantcast