Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hermann Bücking, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1863Born
11 May 189026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
28 Jul 189632.7AppointedPrefect of Togo
1907²43.1ResignedPrefect of Togo
10 Jun 193167.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Togo

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermann Bücking
Father Hermann Bücking S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Togo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorbeck, Germany
Death PlaceMünster

  • a priest for 41.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Dec 2018

Quantcast