Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Cornelius Beyweg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1670BornKöln
169322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
9 Jun 170029.9SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
24 Jan 170130.5ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
24 Jan 170130.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
3 Apr 170130.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
12 Oct 174474.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Cornelius Beyweg:
Bishop Peter Cornelius Beyweg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 266
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013