Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dietrich von Moers

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Apostolic Administrator of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1385¹Born
24 Apr 141429.3SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
30 Aug 141429.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
22 Sep 141429.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 141530.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Apr 141530.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Paderborn, Germany
24 Jan 144661.0ResignedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Jan 144661.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Paderborn, Germany
4 Dec 144762.9AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
4 Dec 144762.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Paderborn, Germany
14 Feb 146378.1DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dietrich von Moers: VIAF:42629109
Archbishop Dietrich von Moers (born 1385, died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 48.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 25 Jan 2016