Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Moers

Deceased

Bishop of Münster

Apostolic Administrator of Osnabrück


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Oct 1424SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
14 Mar 1425ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
Nov 1441AppointedApostolic Administrator of Osnabrück, Germany
2 Jun 1450DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Moers:
Bishop Heinrich von Moers (died ) Bishop of Münster

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 346
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,704
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013